Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Pérez Hernández, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cúcuta, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1894Born
10 Mar 191823.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
3 Nov 194551.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
3 Nov 194551.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradus
6 Jan 194651.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradus
29 May 195661.7AppointedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
28 Jun 195964.8DiedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Pérez Hernández
Bishop Luis Pérez Hernández C.I.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cúcuta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan José de Cúcuta

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast