Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Otero Largacha, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá

Titular Bishop of Rotaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1940BornBogotá
26 Jul 196423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
3 May 198645.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
3 May 198645.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotaria
13 Jun 198645.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotaria
9 May 200463.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Agustín Otero Largacha:
Bishop Agustín Otero Largacha O.A.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,241
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015