Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Villavicencio

Archidioecesis Villavicentiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 July 2004
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 52,000 (20,085 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://arquidiocesisdevillavicencio.org/
  • Mailing Address: Carrera 39 N. 34-19, Villavicencio, Meta, Colombia
  • Telephone: (8)6610.537
  • Fax: 6624.049

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Intendencias Orientales
23 June 1903ErectedArchdiocese of Bogotá Territorial Prelature of Intendencias Orientales (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino)
16 March 1908ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Intendencias Orientales Vicariate Apostolic of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino)
9 June 1949Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino) Prefecture Apostolic of Mitú (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Villavicencio
9 June 1949Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino) Vicariate Apostolic of Villavicencio
16 January 1964Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Villavicencio Prefecture Apostolic of Ariari (erected)
Diocese of Villavicencio
11 February 1964ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Villavicencio Diocese of Villavicencio
Archdiocese of Villavicencio
3 July 2004ElevatedDiocese of Villavicencio Archdiocese of Villavicencio

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Villavicencio
195062,00070,00088.6%25252,480412610ap1951
Diocese of Villavicencio
1966160,000161,00099.4%136374,324168422ap1967
1970195,000200,00097.5%435395,000448832ap1971
1976275,500290,00095.0%937465,989514431ap1977
1980341,999370,00092.4%1333467,4344496032ap1981
1990498,000525,00094.9%3621578,7366304748ap1991
1999518,000595,00087.1%96281244,17710785286ap2000
2000468,000520,00090.0%138341722,72010925496ap2001
2001491,217512,32095.9%120201403,508138433117ap2002
2002525,000540,00097.2%117201373,832132933111ap2003
2003465,000480,00096.9%125161413,297132530115ap2004
Archdiocese of Villavicencio
2004506,000540,00093.7%142211633,104133046118ap2005
2010529,000581,00091.0%173231962,698147184116ap2011
2014673,171691,70497.3%149221713,936105053122ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 3 Jun 2015