Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Alberto Parra Mora

Bishop Emeritus of Mocoa-Sibundoy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1944 BornTenza
9 Oct 197127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
18 Oct 200359.6AppointedBishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia
11 Dec 200359.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia
16 Jan 200459.8InstalledBishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia
1 Dec 201470.7ResignedBishop of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Alberto Parra Mora:
Bishop Luis Alberto Parra Mora (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mocoa-Sibundoy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mocoa-Sibundoy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,489
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 1 Dec 2014