Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Manuel Salamanca Mantilla

Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1961 Born
30 Nov 198625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
7 Nov 201554.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
7 Nov 201554.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
12 Dec 201554.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania

MicroData Summary for Pedro Manuel Salamanca Mantilla
Bishop Pedro Manuel Salamanca Mantilla (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBucaramanga

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bogotá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 8 Nov 2015
  • c2+: CB, 11 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,689

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast