Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de la Cruz Gómez y Plata

Deceased

Bishop of Antioquía


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1795¹BornSan Gil
1819¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 183540.5AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
17 Jan 183641.0Ordained BishopBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
1 Dec 185055.9DiedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de la Cruz Gómez y Plata
Bishop Juan de la Cruz Gómez y Plata (born 1795, died ) Bishop of Antioquía

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1836, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016