Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Cardinal Concha Córdoba

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bogotá, Colombia

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1891Born
28 Oct 191624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
13 Jul 193543.6AppointedBishop of Manizales, Colombia
30 Nov 193544.0Ordained BishopBishop of Manizales, Colombia
10 May 195462.5AppointedArchbishop of Manizales, Colombia
18 May 195967.5AppointedArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
19 May 195967.5AppointedBishop of Colombia, Military
16 Jan 196169.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 196169.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
29 Jul 197280.7RetiredArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
29 Jul 197280.7RetiredBishop of Colombia, Military
18 Sep 197583.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Concha Córdoba
Luis Cardinal Concha Córdoba (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
  • a cardinal for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 90
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast