Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignacio León Velasco, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1834Born
19 Aug 186026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Mar 188348.9AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
3 Jun 188349.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pasto, Colombia
27 May 188955.1AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
10 Apr 189156.9DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ignacio León Velasco
Archbishop Ignacio León Velasco S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlacePopayan
Ordained BishopJesuit Church, Quite, Archdiocese of Quito, Ecuador

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,546
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 271, and Page 443
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast