Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Caicedo Téllez, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cali, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1884Born
30 Apr 190723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Jun 194258.1AppointedBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
16 Aug 194258.3Ordained BishopBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
29 Aug 194258.3InstalledBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
23 Feb 194863.8AppointedBishop of Cali, Colombia
9 Mar 194863.8InstalledBishop of Cali, Colombia
24 Sep 195874.4DiedBishop of Cali, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Julio Caicedo Téllez
Bishop Julio Caicedo Téllez S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Cali

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 39
  • i/c103: Website of the Diocese, 1 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast