Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hipólito Leopoldo Agudelo

Deceased

Bishop of Pasto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1864BornCorrales
2 Sep 193066.4AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
6 Jan 193166.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pasto, Colombia
23 May 193369.1DiedBishop of Pasto, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Hipólito Leopoldo Agudelo:
Bishop Hipólito Leopoldo Agudelo (born , died ) Bishop of Pasto

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013