Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso López de Avila

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1580AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
29 Nov 1591AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
30 Dec 1591DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso López de Avila:
Archbishop Alfonso López de Avila (died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 93, Number 575
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 187, and Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015