Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomé Martinez Menacho y Mesa (Mechado)

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1517²Born
27 Apr 158770.3AppointedBishop of Panamá
4 Sep 1588³71.6Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
20 Dec 158871.9InstalledBishop of Panamá
30 Apr 159376.3AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
17 Aug 159477.6DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Martinez Menacho y Mesa (Mechado)
Archbishop Bartolomé Martinez Menacho y Mesa (Mechado) (born 1517, died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorre de Miguel Sesmero, Diocese of Badajoz, Spain
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru
Death PlaceCartagena, Diocese of Cartagena

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 196, and Page 268
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 101, Number 633
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 187
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1588, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast