Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Rubiano Sàenz

Archbishop Emeritus of Bogotá

Cardinal-Priest of Trasfigurazione di Nostro Signore Gesù Cristo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1932 BornCartago
8 Jul 195623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cali, Colombia
2 Jun 197138.7AppointedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
11 Jul 197138.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
26 Mar 198350.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cali, Colombia
7 Feb 198552.4SucceededArchbishop of Cali, Colombia
27 Dec 199462.3AppointedArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
11 Feb 199562.4InstalledArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
21 Feb 200168.4Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200168.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Trasfigurazione di Nostro Signore Gesù Cristo
25 Feb 200168.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Trasfigurazione di Nostro Signore Gesù Cristo
8 Jul 201077.8RetiredArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Pedro Rubiano Sàenz:
Pedro Cardinal Rubiano Sàenz (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bogotá

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bogotá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2010
  • i: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2001

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Mar 2014