Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Eduardo Dorsonville-Rodríguez

Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Titular Bishop of Kearney


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1960 Born
23 Nov 198525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
1999²38.1IncardinatedPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
20 Mar 201554.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
20 Mar 201554.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Kearney
20 Apr 201554.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Kearney

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mario Eduardo Dorsonville-Rodríguez
Bishop Mario Eduardo Dorsonville-Rodríguez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Washington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá, Colombia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Washington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2015
  • ob: CB, 20 Mar 2015
  • c2+: CB, 15 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast