Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel José Mosquera y Arboleda

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1800BornPopayán
1823¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 183434.7AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
28 Jun 183535.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
10 Dec 185353.7DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel José Mosquera y Arboleda:
Archbishop Manuel José Mosquera y Arboleda (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013