Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquín Pardo y Vergara

Deceased

Archbishop of Medellín, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1843Born
1 Sep 186724.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Dec 186724.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 189148.3AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
1 Feb 189249.0AppointedBishop of Medellín, Colombia
24 Apr 189249.2Ordained BishopBishop of Medellín, Colombia
18 Jun 189249.4InstalledBishop of Medellín, Colombia
21 Mar 190259.1AppointedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
14 Nov 190461.8DiedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Pardo y Vergara
Archbishop Joaquín Pardo y Vergara (born , died ) Archbishop of Medellín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 375, and Page 443
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017