Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco del Rincón, O.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1650BornBorox, Spain
14 Dec 170555.8AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
29 Jun 170757.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
26 Feb 171464.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
5 Oct 171666.6AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
24 Jan 171867.9InstalledArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
28 Jun 172373.4DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Francisco del Rincón:
Archbishop Francisco del Rincón O.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 26, Number 52
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 187, and Page 202
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 409

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015