Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oscar Urbina Ortega

Archbishop of Villavicencio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1947 BornArboledas
30 Nov 197326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
8 Mar 199648.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
8 Mar 199648.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Forconium
13 Apr 199649.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forconium
9 Nov 199952.6AppointedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
30 Nov 200760.6AppointedArchbishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
25 Jan 200860.8InstalledArchbishop of Villavicencio, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Oscar Urbina Ortega:
Archbishop Oscar Urbina Ortega (born ) Archbishop of Villavicencio

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Villavicencio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2007
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,742

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013