Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carrión y Marfil

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trujillo

Note/Previous Titular See: (Abbot of Alcala la Real after Trujillo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1747BornEstepona, Spain
25 Jun 178437.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
25 Jun 178437.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
27 Mar 178537.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
18 Dec 178639.7AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
3 Jul 179851.2AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
24 Jan 182577.8RetiredBishop of Trujillo, Peru
13 May 182780.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Trujillo, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Carrión y Marfil:
Bishop José Carrión y Marfil (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 151, and Page 178
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 420, and Page 451
  • ob/r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 102, Number 527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013