Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Gabriel Romero Franco

Bishop Emeritus of Facatativá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1935 BornBogotá
1 Nov 195823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
6 May 197742.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
6 May 197742.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Maturba
29 Jun 197742.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maturba
15 Apr 198651.1AppointedBishop of Facatativá, Colombia
13 Nov 201075.6RetiredBishop of Facatativá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Gabriel Romero Franco:
Bishop Luis Gabriel Romero Franco (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Facatativá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Facatativá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015