Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Santa Marta

Dioecesis Sanctae Marthae



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 10 January 1534
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Barranquilla
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 14,216 (5,490 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisdesantamarta.org/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Episcopal, Carrera 4 N. 16-42, Santa Marta [Magdalena], Colombia
  • Telephone: (54)421.2643
  • Fax: 421.3661

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
10 January 1534ErectedDiocese of Santa Marta (erected)
11 September 1562Territory LostDiocese of Santa Marta Diocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada (erected)
17 January 1905Territory LostDiocese of Santa Marta Vicariate Apostolic of Goajira (erected)
26 October 1962Territory LostDiocese of Santa Marta Diocese of Ocaña (erected)
17 January 2006Territory LostDiocese of Santa Marta
Diocese of Valledupar
Diocese of El Banco (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950400,000405,00098.8%5326795,0633013336ap1951
1965495,000500,00099.0%4515608,2501514529ap1967
1968600,000611,00098.2%45145910,1691813433ap1971
1976634,000695,00091.2%36134912,9381715836ap1977
1980653,000667,00097.9%3974614,1951316039ap1981
19901,000,0001,138,00087.9%43115418,5181812044ap1991
19991,096,9521,218,83690.0%65107514,62611512945ap2000
20001,096,9521,218,83690.0%71148512,90511913448ap2001
20011,096,6521,218,83690.0%75159012,1852013751ap2002
20021,096,9521,218,83690.0%76149012,18812213350ap2003
20031,096,9521,218,83690.0%79149311,7951914055ap2004
2004922,2001,108,49683.2%77139010,24611611151ap2005
2010680,000780,00087.2%7210828,2921127050ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Aug 2014