Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Sarmiento Angulo

Bishop Emeritus of Fontibón, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1934 Born
24 Oct 195824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
3 May 198651.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
3 May 198651.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Crepedula
13 Jun 198652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Crepedula
13 Aug 199460.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bogotá, Colombia
27 Dec 199460.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Bogotá, Colombia
6 Aug 200369.1AppointedBishop of Fontibón, Colombia
13 Sep 200369.2InstalledBishop of Fontibón, Colombia
25 Nov 201177.4RetiredBishop of Fontibón, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Enrique Sarmiento Angulo
Bishop Enrique Sarmiento Angulo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Fontibón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantafé de Bogotá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fontibón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,146
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,240
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast