Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Martinez Vargas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Armenia, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1897Born
24 Sep 192124.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 194952.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
13 Jul 194952.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
4 Sep 194952.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
195153.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
18 Dec 195255.8AppointedBishop of Armenia, Colombia
8 Feb 197274.9RetiredBishop of Armenia, Colombia
9 Jan 198789.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Armenia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Martinez Vargas
Bishop José de Jesús Martinez Vargas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMogotes

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast