Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Gabriel Calderón Contreras

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cartago


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1919BornBogotá
8 Nov 194223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
18 Dec 195839.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
18 Dec 195839.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Victoriana
6 Jan 195939.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Victoriana
26 Apr 196242.8AppointedBishop of Cartago, Colombia
19 Apr 199575.8RetiredBishop of Cartago, Colombia
15 Mar 200686.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cartago, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Gabriel Calderón Contreras:
Bishop José Gabriel Calderón Contreras (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cartago

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 47.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 3
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013