Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel de Sosa y Béthencourt

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1700¹Born
17 Nov 175555.8AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
26 Jun 175757.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
22 Apr 176565.3AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
12 Nov 176565.8DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Sosa y Béthencourt
Archbishop Manuel de Sosa y Béthencourt (born 1700, died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLas Palmas, Spain

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 150, and Page 216
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1,700, Page 75, Number 368
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,757, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast