Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Amleto Giovanni Cardinal Cicognani

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia

Dean of the College of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1883BornBrisighella, Italy
23 Sep 190522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
17 Mar 193350.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
23 Apr 193350.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
23 Apr 193350.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
15 Dec 195875.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 195875.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
14 Nov 195976.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
12 Aug 196178.4AppointedSecretary of State
23 May 196279.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
21 Jun 196380.3ConfirmedSecretary of State
7 May 196885.2AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
30 Apr 196986.1RetiredSecretary of State
30 Apr 196986.1RetiredPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
24 Mar 197289.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
24 Mar 197289.0ConfirmedDean of the College of Cardinals
17 Dec 197390.8DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Amleto Giovanni Cicognani:
Amleto Giovanni Cardinal Cicognani (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of State

  • a priest for 68.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
  • a cardinal for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 19
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015