Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Louis Morkovsky

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1909Born
5 Dec 193324.3Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
22 Dec 195546.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
22 Dec 195546.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hieron
22 Feb 195646.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hieron
18 Aug 195849.0AppointedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
16 Apr 196353.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
16 Apr 196353.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigava
22 Apr 197565.6SucceededBishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
21 Aug 198475.0RetiredBishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
24 Mar 199080.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Louis Morkovsky
Bishop John Louis Morkovsky (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galveston-Houston

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraha, TX

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017