Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Barbarito

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Great Britain

Titular Archbishop of Fiorentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1922Born
20 Aug 194422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Avellino, Italy
11 Jun 196947.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Fiorentino
11 Jun 196947.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
10 Aug 196947.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Fiorentino
5 Apr 197552.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Niger
5 Apr 197552.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Guinea-Bissau
5 Apr 197552.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mali
5 Apr 197552.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mauritania
5 Apr 197552.9AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Sénégal
10 Jun 197856.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Australia
21 Jan 198663.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Great Britain
13 Apr 199370.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain
31 Jul 199775.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain
12 Mar 201794.8DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Barbarito
Archbishop Luigi Barbarito (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Great Britain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtripalda, Italy
Death PlaceIstituto San Giuseppe delle Suore Francescane Immacolatine, Pietradefusi
Buried Place (Original)Sant’Ippolisto, Atripalda

  • a priest for 72.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Mar 2017