Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Leonard Hagarty, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nassau, Bahamas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1909BornGreene, IA
6 Jun 193627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Jun 195041.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bahama Islands, Bahamas, Antilles
25 Jun 195041.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arba
19 Oct 195041.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arba
5 Jul 196051.2AppointedBishop of Nassau, Bahamas, Antilles
17 Jul 198172.3ResignedBishop of Nassau, Bahamas, Antilles
22 Sep 198475.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nassau, Bahamas, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Paul Leonard Hagarty
Bishop Paul Leonard Hagarty O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nassau

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Nov 2016