Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaetano Cardinal Cicognani

Deceased

Pro-Prefect Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1881Born
24 Sep 190422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
2 Jan 192543.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
10 Jan 192543.1AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Bolivia
1 Feb 192543.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
11 Feb 192543.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
20 May 192846.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
14 Jun 193654.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
16 May 193856.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
12 Jan 195371.1Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195371.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
29 Oct 195371.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
7 Dec 195372.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
18 Nov 195472.9AppointedPro-Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura
14 Nov 195977.9RetiredPro-Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura
14 Dec 195978.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
14 Feb 196078.2InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
5 Feb 196280.1DiedPro-Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Cicognani (VIAF: 63679818)
Gaetano Cardinal Cicognani (born , died ) Pro-Prefect Emeritus of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisighella

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 5
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 50, and Page 51, and Page 72
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 206, and Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast