Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrew Gregory Grutka

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gary, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1908Born
5 Dec 193325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
29 Dec 195648.1AppointedBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
25 Feb 195748.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
9 Jul 198475.6RetiredBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
11 Nov 199384.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Gary, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Andrew Gregory Grutka
Bishop Andrew Gregory Grutka (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoliet

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Jun 2017