Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Lewis Fletcher

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Little Rock, Arkansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1896BornLittle Rock
4 Jun 192023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
11 Dec 193943.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
11 Dec 193943.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Samos
25 Apr 194043.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samos
7 Dec 194650.1AppointedBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
4 Jul 197275.7RetiredBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
6 Dec 197983.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Albert Lewis Fletcher:
Bishop Albert Lewis Fletcher (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Little Rock

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013