Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sergio Cardinal Guerri

Deceased

Pro-President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1905Born
30 Mar 192923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
9 Mar 194842.2AppointedPro-Secretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
7 May 196862.3AppointedSecretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
6 Nov 196862.8AppointedPro-President of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
11 Apr 196963.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trebia
27 Apr 196963.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Trebia
28 Apr 196963.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 Apr 196963.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santissimo Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano
30 Jun 197973.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano
26 Sep 198175.7RetiredPro-President of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
15 Mar 199286.2DiedPro-President Emeritus of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State

MicroData Summary for Sergio Guerri
Sergio Cardinal Guerri (born , died ) Pro-President Emeritus of Vatican City State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTarquinia, Diocese of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia, Italy
Ordained BishopLateran Seminary, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVatican City, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family's Chapel, Cemetery, Tarquinia, Diocese of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Annunziata, Church, Tarquinia, Diocese of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
  • a cardinal for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 41
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Apr 1969

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Jan 2019

Quantcast