Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Coleman Francis Carroll

Deceased

Archbishop of Miami, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1905BornPittsburgh, PA
15 Jun 193025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Aug 195348.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Aug 195348.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pitanae
10 Nov 195348.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pitanae
13 Aug 195853.5AppointedBishop of Miami, Florida, USA
7 Oct 195853.6InstalledBishop of Miami, Florida, USA
2 Mar 196863.0AppointedArchbishop of Miami, Florida, USA
26 Jul 197772.4DiedArchbishop of Miami, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Coleman Francis Carroll:
Archbishop Coleman Francis Carroll (born , died ) Archbishop of Miami

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015