Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Asta

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Titular Archbishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1915BornAlcamo, Italy
25 Jul 193823.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Oct 196247.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
13 Oct 196247.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Indochina
25 Nov 196247.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
23 Mar 196449.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Iran
25 Mar 196651.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Iran
7 Jun 196954.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Turkey
21 Jul 198469.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
Jul 1989³74.5RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
30 Dec 200490.0DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Asta:
Archbishop Salvatore Asta (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Portugal

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 181
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013