Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Aloysius Burke

Deceased

Bishop of Buffalo, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1886BornBuffalo
3 Aug 191225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
17 Apr 194356.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
17 Apr 194356.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vita
29 Jun 194356.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vita
7 Feb 195265.4AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
16 Oct 196276.1DiedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Aloysius Burke:
Bishop Joseph Aloysius Burke (born , died ) Bishop of Buffalo

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013