Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Haas

Deceased

Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1889Born
11 Jun 191324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
26 Sep 194354.5AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
18 Nov 194354.6Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
29 Aug 195364.4DiedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Haas
Bishop Francis Joseph Haas (born , died ) Bishop of Grand Rapids

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRacine, WI

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast