Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pio Cardinal Laghi

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1922BornCastiglione, Italy
20 Apr 194623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
24 May 196947.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mauriana
24 May 196947.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
22 Jun 196947.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Mauriana
28 May 197351.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cyprus
27 Apr 197451.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
10 Dec 198058.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to United States of America
26 Mar 198461.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to United States of America
6 Apr 199067.9AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
28 Jun 199169.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Auxiliatrice in via Tuscolana
28 Jun 199169.1Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jul 199169.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
15 Nov 199977.5RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
26 Feb 200279.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
10 Jan 200986.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)

MicroData Summary for Pio Laghi:
Cardinal Pio Laghi (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
  • a cardinal for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 25 Nov 2013