Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Pizzardo

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1877Born
19 Sep 190326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
7 May 192143.8AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
8 Jun 192951.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
28 Mar 193052.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
22 Apr 193052.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
27 Apr 193052.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
13 Dec 193760.4Elevated to Cardinal
13 Dec 193760.4ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
16 Dec 193760.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via Lata
14 Mar 193961.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
21 Jun 194870.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
21 Jun 194870.9AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
16 Feb 195173.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office
12 Oct 195982.2ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office
17 Nov 196689.3ResignedBishop of Albano, Italy
13 Jan 196890.5RetiredPrefect of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities
1 Aug 197093.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation of Seminaries and Universities

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pizzardo (VIAF: 39473515)
Giuseppe Cardinal Pizzardo (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Seminaries and Universities

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Crypt beneath, S. Giuseppe in Frattocchie, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
  • a cardinal for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 19
  • x933/xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 25, and Page 26, and Page 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast