Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerome Daniel Hannan

Deceased

Bishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1896BornPittsburgh
22 May 192124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
17 Aug 195457.7AppointedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
21 Sep 195457.8Ordained BishopBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
15 Dec 196569.0DiedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Jerome Daniel Hannan:
Bishop Jerome Daniel Hannan (born , died ) Bishop of Scranton

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013