Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Aloysius Pursley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1902BornHartford City
11 Jun 192725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
18 Jul 195048.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
18 Jul 195048.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Pisidia
19 Sep 195048.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Pisidia
21 Feb 195552.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
29 Dec 195654.8AppointedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
26 Feb 195755.0InstalledBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
24 Aug 197674.4ResignedBishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
15 Nov 199896.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Aloysius Pursley:
Bishop Leo Aloysius Pursley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend

  • a priest for 71.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013