Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Civardi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thespiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1886Born
17 Apr 191124.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 196276.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
23 Sep 196276.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thespiae
29 Aug 197185.2DiedTitular Bishop of Thespiae

MicroData Summary for Luigi Civardi
Bishop Luigi Civardi (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Thespiae

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFossarmato-Pavia, Italy

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,962, Number 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast