Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johánnes Gunnarsson, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iceland {Islanda}

Titular Bishop of Hólar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1897Born
14 Jun 192426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
23 Feb 194244.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}
23 Feb 194244.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hólar
7 Jul 194345.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hólar
14 Oct 196770.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Iceland {Islanda}
17 Jun 197274.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iceland {Islanda}

MicroData Summary for Johánnes Gunnarsson
Bishop Johánnes Gunnarsson S.M.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Iceland {Islanda}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReykjavik
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Church, Washington, DC, Archdiocese of Baltimore-Washington, Maryland, USA
Death PlaceSioux Falls, Diocese of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
Buried Place (Original)Vermillion, SD, Diocese of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 41
  • loc: CB, 17 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast