Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Emmet Lucey

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San Antonio, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1891BornLos Angeles, CA
14 May 191625.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Feb 193442.9AppointedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
1 May 193443.1Ordained BishopBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
16 May 193443.1InstalledBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
21 Jan 194149.8AppointedArchbishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
23 May 196978.1RetiredArchbishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
23 May 196978.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tauromenium
31 Dec 197079.7ResignedTitular Archbishop of Tauromenium
1 Aug 197786.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San Antonio, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Emmet Lucey:
Archbishop Robert Emmet Lucey (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Antonio

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015