Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter William Bartholome

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1893BornBellechester
12 Jun 191724.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 194148.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
6 Dec 194148.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
3 Mar 194248.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
31 May 195360.1SucceededBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
31 Jan 196874.8RetiredBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
31 Jan 196874.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanaramusa
13 Jan 197177.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Tanaramusa
17 Jun 198289.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter William Bartholome:
Bishop Peter William Bartholome (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Cloud

  • a priest for 65.0 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015