Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Shaughnessy, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Seattle, Washington


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1887BornEverett, MA
20 Jun 192033.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
1 Jul 193346.1AppointedBishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
19 Sep 193346.3Ordained BishopBishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
10 Oct 193346.3InstalledBishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
18 May 195062.9DiedBishop of Seattle, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Shaughnessy:
Bishop Gerald Shaughnessy S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Seattle

  • a priest for 29.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015