Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Salvatore Cardinal Pappalardo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Palermo

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Odigitria dei Siciliani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1918BornVillafranca Sicula
12 Apr 194122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
7 Dec 196547.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Miletus
7 Dec 196547.2AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Indonesia
16 Jan 196647.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Miletus
7 May 196950.6AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
17 Oct 197052.1AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
5 Mar 197354.5Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197354.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Odigitria dei Siciliani
4 Apr 199677.5RetiredArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
10 Dec 200688.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Pappalardo:
Cardinal Salvatore Pappalardo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Palermo

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
  • a cardinal for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/pres/xpae: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 61, Page 353
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013