Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Joseph Byrne

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1908Born
3 Jun 193324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
10 May 194738.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
10 May 194738.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Etenna
2 Jul 194738.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etenna
16 Jun 195647.8AppointedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
29 Aug 195648.0InstalledBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
19 Mar 196253.6AppointedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
8 May 196253.7InstalledArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
23 Aug 198375.0RetiredArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
2 Aug 199688.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for James Joseph Byrne
Archbishop James Joseph Byrne (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Paul, MN

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast