Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo Binz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1900Born
15 Mar 192423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Rockford, Illinois, USA
21 Nov 194242.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
21 Nov 194242.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinara
21 Dec 194242.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pinara
15 Oct 194948.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
15 Oct 194948.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Silyum
2 Dec 195454.0SucceededArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
16 Dec 196161.1AppointedArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
28 Apr 196261.4InstalledArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
21 May 197574.5RetiredArchbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
9 Oct 197978.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Binz
Archbishop Leo Binz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStockton, IL

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast