Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul John Hallinan

Deceased

Archbishop of Atlanta, Georgia


from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1911BornPainesville
20 Feb 193725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
9 Sep 195847.4AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
28 Oct 195847.5Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
25 Nov 195847.6InstalledBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
19 Feb 196250.8AppointedArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
29 Mar 196250.9InstalledArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
27 Mar 196856.9DiedArchbishop of Atlanta, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul John Hallinan:
Archbishop Paul John Hallinan (born , died ) Archbishop of Atlanta

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015